Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 43 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7050 Week
» 13184 Month
» 241068 Year
» 1462633 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 4989 m/e 12/1946
BR 44989 w/e 24/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 12/1946
Withdrawal w/e Sat 04/02/1967
Scrapping During 09/1967
Service Life 20 yrs, 2 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1946
23C Southport 01/01/1948
17B Burton w/e 25/05/1963
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 24/07/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 04/02/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 17B Burton 4w/e 01/06/1963
WDN   w/e 09/11/1964
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 07/08/1965
WDN   w/e 04/02/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
26/11/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D10, D132-4, 44695, 45101/90, 45200, 45617/74, 45702, 48605, 49395, 78042. Paint Shop Yard: D135, 42213, 44697, 44757, 45608, 45710, 46130, 48252, 48476, 50850, 70048. New Erecting Shop: D1/3/9, D136/7, D214/31, D5140. Erecting Shop: D50-8, D290, 41251, 42148, 42224/55, 42440, 42571, 42679, 44690, 44942-4/89, 45046/92, 45145, 45256/90, 45301/37/86, 45424/93, 45543/52, 45695, 45709, 46133, 46224/53, 46506, 48130, 48399, 48408/45, 48532, 48638/49, 48700/3/36/62, 49130, 49361, 70042, 90188, 90365, 92017/76/82, 92125. Erecting Shop Yard: 42287/94, 44765, 44965, 45186/97, 45719, 46141. Minor Repair Road: 44753, 45646, 92025. Works Sidings: 44746/81, 44887, 45026/42, 45680, 46109, 47255, 47403/5, 48215, 48500/28/51, 78035, 90675, 92016/8, 92163. Scrap Road: 42545, 45401 just cut up, 45630 being cut up, 40033/4/8/64, 40569, 42217, 42467, 42549, 42683, 48927, 49401/53 intact. Works Shunters: 13292, 44374, 51412/46, 47592, 47608/61, 52093, 52218, 52441/59. SLS/196201
15/11/1964 Crewe Works (Side of Works) Erecting shop: D1641-1662; D214, D224, D236, D257, D351, D395/7, D5700/14, D6833/49, D8014/26/35/59, 42581, 42665, 44689, 44710/74, 45215/79, 46484, 48056, 48190, 48301, 48533/56, 48719/40, 92008/74/9/87/8; Near Chester line: 44715, 44844, 44988, 45000, 45660, 46402, 92019; Side of Works: 42089, 42218, 42569, 44658, 44778, 44838, 44989, 45035, 45303, 45412, 45562, 46501, 48168, 48612, 92004/64, 92117/67. Paint shop area: D251, D297, D305, D329, D336, D369, D1633/4/5/7/8/9/40, D5716, D6889, D8058, 42233, 48046/50, 70002/11/34, 92233; Cutting up: 42221, 42559; New Erecting shop: D338, E3002/4, 26025; Inspection road: 44667, 45031, 48206/52, 92139/57; Misc.: 42267/97, 44730, 45089, 45130, 48153/92, 48212/67, 48345/65, 48455, 48529, 48677/85, 48764, 70015/18/37, 80072, 92206, D219, D293, D6774, D8001/36, 26049. SLS/196412

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1946 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4989
Built at Horwich Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
24/07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 44989    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (17B)    
24/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
04/02/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 44989    

prev prev