04/1946 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4971 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sheffield Millhouses (19B) |
|
|
14/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
28/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) |
|
|
03/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44971 |
|
|
15/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (19B) |
|
|
14/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
11/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (19B) |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
27/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
09/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
03/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
02/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
27/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
17/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11B) |
|
|
11/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
10/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) |
|
|
23/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
23/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
17/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D) |
|
|
01/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
03/08/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44971 |
|
|
02/1969 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|