|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
06/07/1961 | St. Rollox Works (Ex-Works) | Diesel Erecting Shop: D3132, D3410, D3528, D5300/3/10/1, D6120/37. Works Yard : 42243, 45157, 45489/92, 57328, 57631, D6111. Steam Erecting Shop: 42690/3, 42804, 42913, 44724, 44820/98, 44920/55, 45047, 45118, 45687/96, 45727, 57617. Waiting Works : 42167, 42780, 44722. Ex-Works: D3279, 42882, 44954, 45083, 45126. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1946 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4954 Built at Horwich Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Crewe North (5A) | ||
28/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carstairs (28C) | ||
27/11/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 44954 | ||
01/10/1949 | Allocation | |||
07/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carstairs (66E) | ||
23/09/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 44954 | ||
01/1967 | Scrapped | Scrapped |