Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1004 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14410 Week
» 67426 Month
» 186953 Year
» 3213806 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4948 |
m/e |
02/1946 |
British Railways |
44948 |
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
174 |
To Service |
During 02/1946 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 16/09/1967 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 7 mths , 16 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1946 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4948 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Fleetwood (24F) |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B) |
|
|
03/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44948 |
|
|
11/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
02/02/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hellifield (24H) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) |
|
|
16/09/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44948 |
|
|
02/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|