Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1054 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18857 Week
» 71873 Month
» 191400 Year
» 3218253 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4941 |
m/e |
12/1945 |
British Railways |
44941 |
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
174 |
To Service |
During 12/1945 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 12/11/1966 |
Service Life |
20 yrs, 11 mths , 13 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
27/11/1966 |
Locations of stored steam locomotives (Colwick) |
Toton-27/11/66 78061/4. Stored Colwick-44811/47/941/84, 45224/89/464, 48073/83/127/37/43/77/90/361/76/88/414/32/538/635/45/51/62/72/90. No steam at Colwick since 5/12/66. |
SLS/196701 |
31/12/1966 |
Colwick MPD (Stored) |
Stored 44847/941/84, 45224/89, 48083/143/361/70/88/651/62/72. Also on shed Dept.29 in steam. |
SLS/196702 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1945 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4941 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
29/10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44941 |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
10/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
28/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
22/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
25/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
12/11/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44941 |
|
|
05/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|