|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/06/1954 | Scottish Miscellany | On 12th June, No. 57460 was working the Killin branch. The following day, the 13th, L.M.S. Class 5's were well in evidence at Fort William; engines on the shed were Nos. 44968, 45245, 45367, 61787, 62011, 62031, 61994/5. Nos. 44928 an 44991 arrived on an eight-coach train. Opinion of the Stanier Blacks was that they were good engines, but spoilt by the injectors, which have been giving a considerable amount of trouble. On 26th June No. 40151 was noted at Aviemore, a N.B.R. 4-4-0 (Glen?) passed Newtonmore in the down direction with a twelve-wheeled coach. No. 42130 was banking from Blair Atholl, while No. 77008 was on the shed. No B.R. Class 5 engines were seen, all trains being handled by Staniers, either singly or in pairs. 54398 'Ben Alder' is still lying at the back of Lochgorm Works. | SLS/195408 |
20/08/1954 | York Area | New BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0s 73053/54 (20A) joined 73045 at the end of June on the Holbeck working to York and Scarborough., During the Bank Holiday period. Horwich Moguls 42795/98 (20A) were also used on this turn, but it was worked on Saturday 7/8/54 by Jubilee 45605 (20A). Standard Diesel shunter 13127 from Darlington Works arrived at York on 21/7/54 hauled by Diesel 12115, which was returning from Darlington Works to Hull. 13127 proceeded to New England later in the day. The Class Y8 shed pilot at York (formerly 8091) has been renumbered Departmental 55. Class B17 61660 (30A) was working on passenger trains between York and Doncaster from 22/7/54 until 24/7/54. York-Scarborough line LMR Stanier Class 5 4-6-0s working on through duties to Scarborough in July and August have included 44660 (21A), 44830 (19B), 44928 (25A), 44986 (19B), 45237 (25B)-on an excursion from Burton-on-Trent-45259 (10C), 45261 (25A), and 45336 (26A); also Standard 4-6-0 73016 (19B). Class 4F 0-4-0 43963 (21A) also worked through from King's Norton to Scarborough on 24/7/54. K3 61889 (31B) worked the up Scarborough Flyer between Scarborough and York on 7/8/54 and on the same day 61947 (31B) worked the 4.45 p:m. from York to Scarborough. On 24/7/54 the 2.12 p.m. from Scarborough to Kings Cross was worked to York by K3 61980 (38B). An unusual B1 at Scarborough on 25/7/54 was 61331 (34A) on an excursion from Penistone. |
SLS/195410 |
08/10/1961 | Crewe Works (Paint Shop) | Paint Shop: D122-6, 42604/68, 44729/59, 44928, 45210/61, 45594, 45635/98, 46427, 49395 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D127, 42447, 42655, 44733, 45077, 45316, 45699, 46225, 78017, 92133. New Electing Shop: D8, D128/9/35-7, D327, D5016/74. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5, D227, D329. Erecting Shop: D130-4, D224, 41209/39, 42050/62, 42289/99, 42465, 42607, 44666/93, 44774, 44836/90, 44934/90, 45003/67, 45102/5/8, 45204/52/62/3, 45332/40, 45454, 45549/50, 45688/90, 46114/43, 46234, 46426, 48036/46/74/85, 48283, 48494, 48611/53, 48712, 49025/70, 49381, 70052, 71000, 90216/42/71, 90486, 92013/81/94, 92150. Outside Erecting Shop: D216, 42446, 42656, 45131, 45505, 45634/83, 48717, 78043, 92123. Minor Repair Road: 45646, 48451. Works Sidings: 41279, 42425, 42574, 44708/17/20/36/7/71, 44864/71, 45154, 45571/96, 45656, 46105/7/38/60, 46406, 48088, 48217, 48477, 48624/36, 49126, 90529/61. Scrap Yard: 40075/7/97, 40118, 42506, 43325, 47421/38/62, 47634, 52389 intact. Works Shunters: D3175, 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 47608, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. | SLS/196111 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1946 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4928 Built at Crewe Works |
||
22/06/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E) | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Blackpool Central (24E) | ||
01/05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 44928 | ||
29/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) | ||
19/04/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G) | ||
17/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) | ||
14/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) | ||
16/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A) | ||
13/01/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Agecroft (26B) | ||
22/10/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) | ||
06/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 44928 | ||
12/1967 | Scrapped | Scrapped |