Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 51 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6027 Week
» 12161 Month
» 240045 Year
» 1461610 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 4926 m/e 02/1946
BR 44926 w/e 07/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 02/1946
Withdrawal w/e Sat 20/04/1968 off Edge Hill (8A)
Scrapping During 10/1968
Service Life 22 yrs, 2 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1946
23C Southport 01/01/1948
24E Blackpool Central 8w/e 14/06/1952
9K Bolton w/e 19/09/1964
9H Patricroft w/e 06/03/1965
9D Newton Heath w/e 19/06/1965
10J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 08/01/1966
8A Edge Hill w/e 23/04/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 20/04/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 23C Southport w/e 16/02/1946
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 9K Bolton 3w/e 03/10/1964
ALLOC 9H Patricroft 5w/e 13/03/1965
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 10J Lancaster Green Ayre 5w/e 08/01/1966
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 07/05/1966
WDN 8A Edge Hill w/e 20/04/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/09/1961 Swindon Works ('A' Shop) 'A' Shop: D604, D816/7/21/3/5/43/70, D3431, D6306/8/21, 2866, 3852, 4003/79/81/7/9, D1000-11, D2379-83, 4117, 4707, 4904/26/33/43/66/79/92/8, 5018/38/74/92, 5208, 5380, 6021/6, 6808/16/25/32/4/40, 6948, 7018/28, 7219, 7825, 7905/21, 13115/84/6, 13259/65, 92215/26. Works Sidings: D820, D2086, D2143/4, D2378, D7000, 1009, 3670, 3839/59, 4100, 4917/8/83, 5000/78, 5951/98, 6014/6/9/27, 6964/87/96, 7200, 7756/75, 7909, 8721, 9400, 9749, 73027, 78008, 92241/5. Triangle: 1640, 5087, 5198, 5516, 5934/75, 8762/72/87, 9751, 13355. Dump: 1361/6, 1433, 1604, 5318, 6720, 7745/98, 8429, 8740/74/7/89, 9735/6/67. 'C' Shop: 4203, 5110/95. Outside Stock Shed: D806, D4025, D6303, 4948, 5815, 6900. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: D801. Gasworks : Nil. SLS/196111

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1946 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4926
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
07/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 44926    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
19/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
06/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (9H)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
08/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (10J)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
20/04/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 44926 from Edge Hill (8A)    

prev prev