Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 526 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18329 Week
» 71345 Month
» 190872 Year
» 3217725 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4915 |
m/e |
12/1945 |
British Railways |
44915 |
w/e |
10/12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
174 |
To Service |
During 12/1945 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 09/12/1967 |
Service Life |
22 yrs , 9 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1945 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4915 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Northampton (2C) |
|
|
27/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
10/12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44915 |
|
|
13/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (11A) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
10/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
09/12/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44915 |
|
|
10/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|