09/07/1949 |
St. Rollox Works |
Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 40187, 575, 614, 40670, 40914, 1138, 42416/18, 42751, 42830, 2875, 42912/14, 4011, 4198, 44234, 4881/86/99, 44900/31/77, 45008, 45120/55/60/65/66/70/92, 45423, 5432, 45452/61/89, 45577/84, 45643, 15141/89, 15211/37, 55356, 16162, 16247/75/95, 56359, 17282, 17411, 17554, 57619, 17625/67. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. |
SLS/194908 |
30/11/1949 |
St. Rollox Works |
Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 40170, 40651/63, 687, 40907/09, 912/22, 1129/34, 41177, 1182, 2691, 42699, 2736, 42749, 2880, 42927, 44699, 44900, 4956, 44959/75, 45029/49, 45117/23/52/72, 45251, 45356/62/63, 45463/64/74/85/90, 45575/79, 45728, 7332, 47540, 14450, 14500/01, 55200, 15203/29, 16152, 56170, 16318, 56320, 16328/34, 17270, 57312, 17437, 17593, 17642. On 12/11, No. 54472, the first ex C.R. locomotive to bear the crest was ex Works. |
SLS/195001 |
13/08/1952 |
Newton Stewart |
With the start of the lamb sales 'Cattle Specials' are now frequent. Two 32-wagon trains, destined for Glasgow, via Girvan, left on the afternoon of 13/8, headed by 42916 (67A) and 42749 (68C) respectively. The Newcastle-Stranraer day express was worked by 44900 (68A) on the same date. 45169 (68B) was heading the Stranraer 'milk empties.' Two freights each way are operated daily on the Newton Stewart-Whithorn branch by a couple of ex-Caledonian 0-6-0 'Jumbo's,' both with 'stove-pipe' chimneys. Goods traffic on the branch is quite heavy. The first trip also runs a turn from Millisle to Garlieston and back. All signal-boxes on the branch, except that at Millisle, have been replaced by Ground Frames. Millisle box is open from 9.20 to 5.20 daily. The creameries at Whithorn, Bladnoch and Sortie, alone provide sufficient traffic to assure the continued operation of the Isle of Whithorn branch. |
SLS/195211 |
16/12/1963 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Paint Shop: 49395, D252/8, D1031, D1550/1, D1554-7, 26056. Outside: 44671/86, 45072/139/491, 45736, 46452, 48255/411/632, 70025, 73128, 77002, 78028, D229, D287, D356/74, D1032/3, D1552/3. Weigh House: 45327. Yard: 42355, 44714/919, 45006/19/308/75/406/38, 46142, 46448, 48219/415/8, 78023, 92034/67/90/114, D338. Electric Traction Shop: D202, D8006, 26016, 27002. Erecting Shop: 42076, 44726/856/900/32/58, 45003/280/96/316,, 48128/412/614/48/706, 73127, 78033/64, 84013, 92011/24/81/111/128/59/83, D221, D280/8/9/93/4, D301/14/45/69/85/92, D6758, D8024/67. New Construction: D1034 an D1558-75. Outside: 44676, 46143 and 42441remains. Cut-up Shop: 42785 an 90338. |
SLS/196401 |
27/02/1966 |
Crewe Works (Erecting shop) |
Erecting shop: 44794, 44848, 44900, 45044/80, 45130, 45268/84/92, 48010/317, 92026/87/93, 92208/33, D220/3/41/83/99, D338, D1551/66/75/86, D1603/11/97, D1707/33, D1996-9, D1100-4, D5706, D8010/6; Electric shop: E3037/41/5/67/168, 26013/34/53, 27003; New Diesel shop: D243/70, D352/3/90, D1507/15/21/3/7, D1646/89/778, D1910/75; Works yard: D209, D1599, D1720, 45493, 48037/121, 70038; Traverser area: D272/8, D1503/17/24, D1675, D1863, D1914/71, D5715, E3049; On Test: D313/80/99, D1528/45/58, D1683, D1741/6, D8008; Paint shop: D259, D331, D1991-5, D292/6, D5709, D8050, E3102, 45096, 48062/3, 92020 and stored 46235, 71000. |
SLS/196604 |
27/03/1966 |
Crewe South Shed (ex-Works) |
ex-Works: 44900, 45130, 45493, 48171. |
SLS/196605 |