Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 120 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6096 Week
» 12230 Month
» 240114 Year
» 1461679 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 4887 m/e 08/1945
BR 44887 w/e 01/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 08/1945
Withdrawal w/e Sat 09/12/1967
Scrapping During 02/1968
Service Life 22 yrs, 4 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1945
23C Southport 01/01/1948
27B Aintree w/e 17/03/1962
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 18/05/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 09/12/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 31/03/1962
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 01/06/1963
WDN 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 09/12/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
26/11/1961 Crewe Works (Works Sidings) Paint Shop: D10, D132-4, 44695, 45101/90, 45200, 45617/74, 45702, 48605, 49395, 78042. Paint Shop Yard: D135, 42213, 44697, 44757, 45608, 45710, 46130, 48252, 48476, 50850, 70048. New Erecting Shop: D1/3/9, D136/7, D214/31, D5140. Erecting Shop: D50-8, D290, 41251, 42148, 42224/55, 42440, 42571, 42679, 44690, 44942-4/89, 45046/92, 45145, 45256/90, 45301/37/86, 45424/93, 45543/52, 45695, 45709, 46133, 46224/53, 46506, 48130, 48399, 48408/45, 48532, 48638/49, 48700/3/36/62, 49130, 49361, 70042, 90188, 90365, 92017/76/82, 92125. Erecting Shop Yard: 42287/94, 44765, 44965, 45186/97, 45719, 46141. Minor Repair Road: 44753, 45646, 92025. Works Sidings: 44746/81, 44887, 45026/42, 45680, 46109, 47255, 47403/5, 48215, 48500/28/51, 78035, 90675, 92016/8, 92163. Scrap Road: 42545, 45401 just cut up, 45630 being cut up, 40033/4/8/64, 40569, 42217, 42467, 42549, 42683, 48927, 49401/53 intact. Works Shunters: 13292, 44374, 51412/46, 47592, 47608/61, 52093, 52218, 52441/59. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1945 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4887
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
01/01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 44887    
17/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
18/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
09/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 44887    

prev prev