|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
27/08/1949 | St. Rollox Works | Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 579/97, 600, 40901/05, 41142, 42745, 2806/81, 43849, 4009, 4255. 4879, 5012, 45081, 45115/20/53/57/62/63/71/73/78/79, 45359, 45455/58/60/68/86/87, 45560/79/83, 45645, 45729/31, 46107, 54446/58/92/96, 15167, 55187, 15194, 55197, 15200, 16360/66, 17356, 17407, 57465, 17585, 17621. | SLS/194910 |
31/03/1963 | Settle-Carlisle diversions (In steam) | Settle-Carlisle trains have been running via Ingleton during March in the daytime; single line operation at Dent during the night. The 'Waverley' is expected to be resumed between Leeds and Edinburgh in April. | SLS/196304 |
30/03/1963 | Forfar MPD (In steam) | On shed at Forfar on0th March, 1963: In steam 45473 (pilot), 44796/97, 44879, 45475, Stored 60522, 73107, 44257 (now cut up), 54486/89/93, 54500, 55263, 56347. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1945 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4879 Built at Crewe Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) | ||
03/09/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 44879 | ||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Perth South (63A) | ||
30/04/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
26/11/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Perth South (63A) | ||
22/04/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 44879 | ||
09/1967 | Scrapped | Scrapped |