|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
18/06/1967 | Crewe South MPD (condemned or waiting Works) | Stored-LNER 4498, 44843, 45042, 45243/64/98, 45353/91, 45494; condemned or waiting Works-43024/34, 44666/85, 44737/79, 44800/12/4/60/5, 45006/33, 45197, 45446, 47566, 48011/449/502/548/705, 71000, 78036, 92032. | SLS/196708 |
29/10/1967 | Crewe South MPD (Withdrawn) | 45285/7, 48018, 48729, 92047, 70004/24/31/45. Stored-48402, LNER 4498. Withdrawn-D2519, 15000/2, 42647, 43001/3/7/21, 44680/1/4, 44765, 44805/8/12/4/21/32/3/43/60/5, 44944, 45006/21/42/52/60/89,45186, 45243/70/8/97/8, 45308, 45405/94, 46520, 48220, 48364, 48474, 48521/2/48, 48603/43, 48725/67, 75029, 76051, 92100. | SLS/196712 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1944 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4860 Built at Crewe Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Llandudno Junction (7A) | ||
10/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
08/10/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 44860 | ||
24/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
14/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
29/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rugby (2A) | ||
20/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
02/10/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Banbury (2D) | ||
17/09/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stoke (5D) | ||
28/01/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 44860 | ||
04/1968 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |