Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 54 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17857 Week
» 70873 Month
» 190400 Year
» 3217253 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4847 |
m/e |
11/1944 |
British Railways |
44847 |
w/e |
25/06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
170 |
To Service |
During 11/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 12/11/1966 |
Service Life |
22 yrs , 12 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/07/1958 |
Market Harborough MPD |
Now that this LNWR depot is in the Midland Division, all wash-outs are performed at Leicester (15C) instead of Rugby. On 20th July locomotives on shed were-42446(15F), 42673(2A), 44388(15F), 44847(14D), 48290(2E), 48445(2E), 48601(1A) and 49444(15F). 49447 was at Leicester, |
SLS/195808 |
27/11/1966 |
Locations of stored steam locomotives (Colwick) |
Toton-27/11/66 78061/4. Stored Colwick-44811/47/941/84, 45224/89/464, 48073/83/127/37/43/77/90/361/76/88/414/32/538/635/45/51/62/72/90. No steam at Colwick since 5/12/66. |
SLS/196701 |
31/12/1966 |
Colwick MPD (Stored) |
Stored 44847/941/84, 45224/89, 48083/143/361/70/88/651/62/72. Also on shed Dept.29 in steam. |
SLS/196702 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4847 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
17/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
25/06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44847 |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (19B) |
|
|
17/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (14D) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) |
|
|
11/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (16B) |
|
|
23/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E) |
|
|
18/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
12/11/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44847 |
|
|
05/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|