|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/09/1947 | Crewe Works | Nos. 4758 , 4759 and 4760 the first three Class 5 4-6-0's with roller bearings (Order E467) were completed on 2/9, 11/9, and 18/9 respectively. Class 5 4-6-0's Nos. 4826 and 4827 were converted to oil-burning w/e 6/9 and 13/9 respectively whilst Nos. 4830 and 4844 were both dealt with in a similar manner during w/e 20/9. The latest 'Royal Scot' to be rebuilt was No. 6111 , which was completed on 10/9. Nos. 6228 and 6245 will be the next 'Pacifics' to have the streamline casing removed. No. 6202 went into traffic again on 10/9, having been on Works since 18/8. Ex L. & .N.W.R. No. 9336 (withdrawn w/e 2/8/47) was finally cut-up during w/e 6/9/47. Additional engines cut up were: Nos. 25797 w/e 13/9, 27552 and 28603 w/e 20/9. The ex L. &Y. 0-6-2T (Stationary boiler No. 4608) has recently been through the Works and has been completely repainted black. It is lettered LMS in standard size letters on the tank sides together with the number 4608 on the bunker sides. | SLS/194710 |
15/11/1964 | Crewe Works (Near Chester line) | Erecting shop: D1641-1662; D214, D224, D236, D257, D351, D395/7, D5700/14, D6833/49, D8014/26/35/59, 42581, 42665, 44689, 44710/74, 45215/79, 46484, 48056, 48190, 48301, 48533/56, 48719/40, 92008/74/9/87/8; Near Chester line: 44715, 44844, 44988, 45000, 45660, 46402, 92019; Side of Works: 42089, 42218, 42569, 44658, 44778, 44838, 44989, 45035, 45303, 45412, 45562, 46501, 48168, 48612, 92004/64, 92117/67. Paint shop area: D251, D297, D305, D329, D336, D369, D1633/4/5/7/8/9/40, D5716, D6889, D8058, 42233, 48046/50, 70002/11/34, 92233; Cutting up: 42221, 42559; New Erecting shop: D338, E3002/4, 26025; Inspection road: 44667, 45031, 48206/52, 92139/57; Misc.: 42267/97, 44730, 45089, 45130, 48153/92, 48212/67, 48345/65, 48455, 48529, 48677/85, 48764, 70015/18/37, 80072, 92206, D219, D293, D6774, D8001/36, 26049. | SLS/196412 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1944 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4844 Built at Crewe Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B) | ||
24/04/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 44844 | ||
26/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) | ||
01/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
29/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aston (3D) | ||
12/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
10/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
04/08/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stoke (5D) | ||
18/08/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
02/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) | ||
28/11/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
19/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
29/04/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) | ||
11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 44844 from Speke Junction (8C) | ||
03/1968 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |