|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/01/1965 | Crewe Works (Erecting shop) | Erecting shop: D1661-71, D1672-7 bodies, D225, D267, D299, D335, D1502/10/21/35/68/9, D1604/7, D1724/44, D5710, D6854, D8048, 42141/252/468/699, 44682/773/841/965, 48163/8/204/327/612/77/97/739, 70008/15/23/42/5, 92015/93/167/9. Outside: D1653/60, D1515, D1701, D229, 44684, 48315/751, 92002. Side of Works: 44691/717, 45300, 70022/35, 48035/322/423. Paint shop: E3704, 71000 stored, D236, D347, D1655/6/9, D5714. Outside: D1654/7/8, D1756, D5700, D6853, D8060, E3018, 45193, 48212, 78041, 92047/132/9. Traverser area: 44778, D233, D382, D1511/30, D1688, D5703, D7594, D8036/42/61. | SLS/196503 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1944 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4841 Built at Crewe Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Nottingham (16A) | ||
08/04/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 44841 | ||
20/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltley (21A) | ||
04/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) | ||
08/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltley (21A) | ||
03/04/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oxley (2B) | ||
22/10/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 44841 | ||
02/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |