|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
18/03/1959 | FA Cup excursions | The Norwich-Luton cup replay of 18th March brought the following to Birmingham New Street-Bls 61046/8 of 32A, 61204 of 31F and 61270/317 of 32A; Class 5s 44810/6 an 45238, all 14A. | SLS/195904 |
09/02/1964 | Crewe Works (Outside Erecting Shop) | Scrap Yard: 40147, 42313, 44096, 44216. Traction Shop: D202, D374, D8006, D8054, E3007, 27000. Outside Traction Shop: D201, D272, D1561 painted, D1591, D1592, D1593, D1594 shell only, D6756, D6843, D8050, 92031. Outside Erecting Shop: D300, 42202, 44816, 45140, 45200, 48186, 48268, 92118, 92177. Erecting Shop: D222, D235, D238, D242, D271, D292, D332, D382, D384, D1570 undercoat, D1571 undercoat, D1572 motors mounted, D1573 motors mounted, D1574 motors mounted, D1575 motors mounted, D1576 motors mounted, D1577, D1578, D1579, D1580, D1581, D1582, D1583, D1584, D1585, D1586, D1587, D1588, D1589, D1590 shell only, D5717 (which is the first of the class seen at this works), D6731, D6766, D6848, D6856, D6878, D8010, D8014, D8022, 41272, 42066, 42074, 44762, 44843, 45045, 45109, 45264, 45289, 45368, 48399, 48409, 48495, 48620, 48688, 70001, 70038, 78020, 92099, 92161. Works Yard: D203, D350, 42229, 42463, 44012, 44760, 44831, 44837, 44852, 44918, 45032, 45069, 45075, 45128, 45278, 45464, 45495, 45569, 46490, 46492, 48154, 48394, 48452, 48637, 48668, 48734, 48736, 48753, 73137, 84008, 92129, 92155, 92188. Outside Paint Shop: D246, D250, D327, D369, D1556 painted, D1557 painted, D1558 painted, D1559 painted, D1562 painted. Paint Shop: D1073, D1560, D1563, D1564, D1565, D1566, D1567, D1568, D1569. | SLS/196403 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1944 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4816 Built at Derby Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B) | ||
03/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
13/08/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 44816 | ||
10/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) | ||
24/03/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Derby (17A) | ||
22/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Burton (17B) | ||
25/05/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Southport (27C) | ||
20/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bank Hall (8K) | ||
27/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) | ||
18/09/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bolton (9K) | ||
30/04/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bank Hall (8K) | ||
22/10/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aintree (8L) | ||
17/06/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) | ||
07/10/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) | ||
06/1968 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cohens: Kettering | ||
20/07/1968 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 44816 |