Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 54 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17857 Week
» 70873 Month
» 190400 Year
» 3217253 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4811 |
m/e |
10/1944 |
British Railways |
44811 |
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Order Number |
170 |
To Service |
During 10/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/10/1966 |
Service Life |
22 yrs , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1967 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
21B |
Bournville |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
ALLOC |
17B |
Burton |
4w/e |
26/03/1955 |
ALLOC |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
5w/e |
31/01/1959 |
ALLOC |
16C |
Derby |
4w/e |
07/12/1963 |
LOAN |
16B |
Colwick |
on |
03/01/1966 |
ALLOC |
16B |
Colwick |
5w/e |
08/01/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
27/11/1966 |
Locations of stored steam locomotives (Colwick) |
Toton-27/11/66 78061/4. Stored Colwick-44811/47/941/84, 45224/89/464, 48073/83/127/37/43/77/90/361/76/88/414/32/538/635/45/51/62/72/90. No steam at Colwick since 5/12/66. |
SLS/196701 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4811 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Saltley (21A) |
|
|
12/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44811 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournville (21B) |
|
|
26/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
10/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
23/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
25/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44811 |
|
|
02/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|