Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 255 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7262 Week
» 13396 Month
» 241280 Year
» 1462845 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 4809 m/e 09/1944
BR 44809 w/e 03/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 09/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/08/1968
Scrapping During 11/1968
Service Life 23 yrs, 11 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1944
17A Derby 01/01/1948
17F Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 30/11/1957
9A Longsight w/e 23/02/1963
27C Southport w/e 18/05/1963
10A Carnforth w/e 24/07/1965
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 07/08/1965
8M Southport w/e 11/09/1965
8K Bank Hall w/e 18/06/1966
8L Aintree w/e 22/10/1966
8B Warrington Dallam w/e 17/06/1967
9D Newton Heath w/e 07/10/1967
10A Carnforth w/e 06/07/1968
   Withdrawn w/e 03/08/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 17F Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 9A Longsight 4w/e 30/03/1963
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 07/08/1965
ALLOC 8M Southport 5w/e 11/09/1965
ALLOC 8K Bank Hall 4w/e 09/07/1966
ALLOC 8L Aintree 5w/e 12/11/1966
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 08/07/1967
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 4w/e 07/10/1967
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 01/07/1968
WDN 10A Carnforth w/e 03/08/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/11/1965 Crewe Works (Outside paint shop) Main Erecting shop: 42249, 44690, 44761, 45021/150, 48176/214/53/78/92, 48544, 48775, 70010/25/6/9/53. 92012, D181, D208/15/21/89/97, D311/32/82/98, D1518/32/42/50/7/60/7/84/97, D1980-9. Electric shop: E3014/45/7/51/86, 26002/8, 27002. New Diesel Repair Shop: D153, D1534/70/82, D1683, D1717/76, D1843/60. Test Area: D1536/72, D1976, D5705/14. Traverser Area: 45421, 48545, 70013, 26027, E3060, D376/7, D1516/23/8/68, D1646/89, D1715, D1849, D5244, D5716. Side of Works: 48744, 70047, 92117/228, E3052. Paint shop: D1974/5/7/8/9, 46235, D305/58, E3054/97, D5709. Outside paint shop: 44809, 48033, 92063 re-painted, D347, D1541, D1634, D1770, D5710. SLS/196512

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1944 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4809
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Derby (17A)    
03/07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 44809    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (17F)    
23/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
18/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
24/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
07/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
11/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (8M)    
18/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (8K)    
22/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
17/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
07/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
06/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
03/08/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 44809    

prev prev