|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1950 | St. Rollox Works | Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 595, 612, 40907/11, 42208, 42415, 42738/44/57, 42805, 42916, 43973, 4183, 44801, 44956, 45085/86, 45100/16/17/56/61/64/68/92, 45356, 45458/75/80/83/89/99, 45646, 46121, 14443, 54460, 54649, 56153, 16230/33, 56240, 16241, 56263, 16288, 16322/30/47, 17265, 57272, 57311/35, 17410/44/46, 57566, 17628, 57652. | SLS/195005 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1944 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4801 Built at Derby Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Crewe North (5A) | ||
05/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Perth South (29A) | ||
14/05/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 44801 | ||
21/10/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) | ||
16/02/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hurlford (67B) | ||
05/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 44801 | ||
09/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |