|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1950 | Inverness Lochgorm Works | Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 44787, 45127, 45467/77, 54471, 56301. | SLS/195005 |
11/07/1963 | Glasgow (St. Rollox) (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: 42124, 42259, 42780, 44705/787, 45365, 45473, D359, D3009, D3533, D3741, D5128, D6124, D8076. Waiting Works: 42196, 42274, 42699, 42735, 44701, 45178. D3563, D5356. Ex-Works: 42736, 45053, D6123. Diesel Test House: D361, D3557. Works Shunters: D3412/6. Stored: GSWR 0-6-0T, D6100/1/2/4/6/7/14/8/20/5/7/30. | SLS/196308 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1947 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4787 Built at Horwich Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
14/08/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (27A) | ||
27/11/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 44787 | ||
14/05/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
19/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) | ||
22/11/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 44787 | ||
02/1966 | Scrapped | Scrapped |