09/06/1947 |
Crewe Works |
Further Class 5 4-6-0's have been completed as follows: Nos. 4773 (5/5), 4774 (10/5), 4775 (17/5), 4776 (24/5), 4777 (31/5) and 4778 (9/6). These are all receiving lettering, etc., in the new style. The latest 4-6-2 to have the streamline casing removed is No. 6247 , she was ex the Erecting Shop on 4/6 and No. 6240 will be dealt with next. No. 6115 is the next 'Scot' to be rebuilt, while the next 'Patriots' to be converted are Nos. 5529 and 5528 (in that order), the former will probably be in traffic early in July. No. 4829 is being fitted for oil-burning and the 2-8-0's so fitted include Nos. 8191, 8273, and 8696. Since the end of April the following locos. have been withdrawn: Nos. 6619, 6653, 6723, 6728, 6876, 6894, 6927, 6930, 7682, 7709, 28262, 28278, 28422, 28524, 28589, 28614. |
SLS/194708 |
07/02/1953 |
Edinburgh, Murrayfield |
Once again the International Rugby Match between Scotland and Wales provided Edinburgh with its biggest influx of special trains for any one event, 31 arriving between Thursday and Saturday morning from Wales, 24 at Princes Street, 7 at Waverley. On Thursday, 5 arrived at Princes Street during the day and among the locos were Nos. 45725 (19B) and 45552 (5A). The coaches included a set of Southern malachite green boat train coaches, a number of which were second class. All Thursday's locos were sent to Carstairs. Friday produced another 6 at Princes Street headed by such Jubilee's as 45686 (5A); 45627 (14B), 45703 (3B); 45735 (1B); and 45742 (9A). On Saturday 7 arrived at Waverley, 3 of which were hauled by 64B locos the rest by Stanier 5, 44711 (2A); 44759 (5A); 44774 (20A) and 44775 (20A). The 13 arrivals due at Princes Street started at 4.23 a.m. continuing till 10.16 a.m. Among the foreigners were 46166 (5A); 45654 (19B); 46138 (1B); 45670 (8A). The average number of cars per train was eleven and most trains had restaurant cars, all of which were Western Region with W.R. men who were provided with sleeping accommodation in five sleeping cars in Lothian Road Goods Yard. The return working of these trains started at 10.0 p.m. on Saturday and they continued to leave at roughly 10 minute intervals till 1.0 p.m. on Sunday, with breaks only between 2.10 a.m. till 9.5 am. and 10.10 a.m. and 11.25 a.m. The 7 from Waverley left between 11 p.m. and 2 a.m. Saturday night. Great credit is due to all concerned that only one train was over an hour in arriving; this was due to the one and only engine failure. Even greater credit is due to the organisation which successfully got every train out of Princes Street on time, on Sunday, and there is no doubt that a great victory over the buses was achieved. |
SLS/195304 |
08/10/1961 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Paint Shop: D122-6, 42604/68, 44729/59, 44928, 45210/61, 45594, 45635/98, 46427, 49395 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D127, 42447, 42655, 44733, 45077, 45316, 45699, 46225, 78017, 92133. New Electing Shop: D8, D128/9/35-7, D327, D5016/74. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5, D227, D329. Erecting Shop: D130-4, D224, 41209/39, 42050/62, 42289/99, 42465, 42607, 44666/93, 44774, 44836/90, 44934/90, 45003/67, 45102/5/8, 45204/52/62/3, 45332/40, 45454, 45549/50, 45688/90, 46114/43, 46234, 46426, 48036/46/74/85, 48283, 48494, 48611/53, 48712, 49025/70, 49381, 70052, 71000, 90216/42/71, 90486, 92013/81/94, 92150. Outside Erecting Shop: D216, 42446, 42656, 45131, 45505, 45634/83, 48717, 78043, 92123. Minor Repair Road: 45646, 48451. Works Sidings: 41279, 42425, 42574, 44708/17/20/36/7/71, 44864/71, 45154, 45571/96, 45656, 46105/7/38/60, 46406, 48088, 48217, 48477, 48624/36, 49126, 90529/61. Scrap Yard: 40075/7/97, 40118, 42506, 43325, 47421/38/62, 47634, 52389 intact. Works Shunters: D3175, 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 47608, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. |
SLS/196111 |
15/10/1961 |
Crewe Works (Outside Paint Shop) |
Paint Shop: D124-8, 42667/8, 44679/82/3, 44729/30, 45131, 45210, 45594, 45698, 46108/60, 49395, 78043. Outside Paint Shop: D123, 41209, 42425, 42656, 44696, 44774, 44893/4, 44988, 45108, 45262, 45635/56, 48085, 48283, 48477, 48717, 49025, 49125, 70052, 71000, 92081. Works Sidings: 42619/65, 44845, 45041, 45204/85, 45549, 46425, 47448, 48660, 49070, 49381, 90218, 92024/67. Erecting Shop: D8, D129-34, 41209/79, 42050, 42289/99, 42436/65, 42607/31, 44666/93/5, 44708/17/37, 44864/76/90, 44934/90, 45038/67, 45105, 45207/52/95, 45332, 45420, 45505/50/71/3, 45688/90, 45740. 46105/7, 48036/46/74, 48217, 48365, 48451, 48611/24/36/53, 48712, 49423, 90121, 90216/42/71, 90486, 90561, 92119/50. Outside Erecting Shop: D5141, 42062, 45003, 45102, 45263, 45340, 45454, 45646, 46113/43, 46234, 46426, 48494, 92013. New Erecting Shop: D135-7, D227, D327, D5016. Outside New Erecting Shop: D329. Scrap Yard-intact: 40075/7/97, 47421/38/62, 47634 intact. Scrap Yard-just cut up: 40118, 42506, 43325, 43863, 52389. Works Shunters: 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 51446, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441/59, D3763. |
SLS/196111 |
10/10/1964 |
Crewe Works (Works yard) |
Erecting shop: D1631-6 Motors, D1636-43 Equip., D1644-53 bodies; D243/71/87/97, D345/77/90/9, D5706/16, D6737, D8038/44/7, 42187, 42546, 44715, 44803/57, 44934, 45038, 45307/92, 48081, 48155/205/310/34/552/617, 70033/53, 78023, 84028, 92024/98, 92100; New Erecting shop: D324/36/8/53, 26025/57, 27005. Traverser Area: D237 on test, D1630 on test, D301/5/80/2, D5714, D6787/911, E3014, 26030, 44838, 45005/191, 45455, 48002/24/46/160/435/639/719/21, 70002/22, 92233; Paint shop: D221, D1627/8, D8017; Outside paint shop: D290, D304/48, D1629, 44688/779/846, 46847, 48356, 84015/25; Works yard: D232, 44710/74/985, 45279, 46484, 46519, 48306/57/533/654/740, 70011/34, 80072, 92008/74/9. |
SLS/196411 |
15/11/1964 |
Crewe Works (Erecting shop) |
Erecting shop: D1641-1662; D214, D224, D236, D257, D351, D395/7, D5700/14, D6833/49, D8014/26/35/59, 42581, 42665, 44689, 44710/74, 45215/79, 46484, 48056, 48190, 48301, 48533/56, 48719/40, 92008/74/9/87/8; Near Chester line: 44715, 44844, 44988, 45000, 45660, 46402, 92019; Side of Works: 42089, 42218, 42569, 44658, 44778, 44838, 44989, 45035, 45303, 45412, 45562, 46501, 48168, 48612, 92004/64, 92117/67. Paint shop area: D251, D297, D305, D329, D336, D369, D1633/4/5/7/8/9/40, D5716, D6889, D8058, 42233, 48046/50, 70002/11/34, 92233; Cutting up: 42221, 42559; New Erecting shop: D338, E3002/4, 26025; Inspection road: 44667, 45031, 48206/52, 92139/57; Misc.: 42267/97, 44730, 45089, 45130, 48153/92, 48212/67, 48345/65, 48455, 48529, 48677/85, 48764, 70015/18/37, 80072, 92206, D219, D293, D6774, D8001/36, 26049. |
SLS/196412 |