Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 788 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14194 Week
» 67210 Month
» 186737 Year
» 3213590 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4769 |
m/e |
04/1947 |
British Railways |
44769 |
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
187 |
To Service |
During 04/1947 |
Withdrawal |
During 07/1965 |
Service Life |
18 yrs, 2 mths , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
26/04/1947 |
Crewe Works |
A further four new Class 5 4-6-0's have been completed here - Nos. 4769-4772, and 4-6-2 No. 6242 has had the streamline casing removed. The following were in the Works yard on 26/4 awaiting cutting-up:- 6652, 6690, 6755, 6870, 6925, 6936, 7765, 7772, 7795, 25304, 25802, 27555, 27654, 27493, 28117 and 27558, the latter having been partially cut-up. It is understood that the order for new Class 5 4-6-0's to be built at Crewe comprises Nos. 4738-4782 whilst Horwich will build Nos. 4783-4799. |
SLS/194706 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1947 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4769 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Perth South (29A) |
|
|
31/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
31/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44769 |
|
|
29/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44769 |
|
|
01/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|