Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 128 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6104 Week
» 12238 Month
» 240122 Year
» 1461687 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 4767 m/e 12/1947
BR 44767 w/e 01/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 12/1947
Withdrawal w/e Sat 30/12/1967
Service Life 20 yrs , 1 mth

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1947
5A Crewe North 01/01/1948
27C Southport w/e 17/03/1962
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 14/11/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 30/12/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 5A Crewe North w/e 03/01/1948
LOAN 27A Polmadie w/e 11/02/1950
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 31/03/1962
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 05/12/1964
WDN 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 30/12/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/12/1947 Crewe Works New Construction 7/12: In addition to Nos. 6256 and 4765 mentioned, No. 4766 was complete. No. 4767 had the frames, cylinders and boiler mounted, No. 4748 frames and cylinders-boiler not yet mounted-while frames and cylinders for Nos. 4749/50 were all in the Erecting Shop. The frames and cylinders of Nos: 4751/2 were in the Yard, while the Heavy Machine Shop contained the frames and cylinders for No. 6257. The frames only of Nos. 4753/54/55 were visible. Nos. 4759/61 were under repair, while No. 4762 was on the North Shed. No less than 13 of the L.N.E.R. '0.6's' were on the Works. SLS/194801
31/01/1948 Crewe Works The last two Class '5' 4-6-0's of Order E467 (Nos. 4766 and 4767 ) were completed on 17/12 and 30/12 respectively. The latter engine is fitted with outside Stephenson's valve gear and both engines are equipped with electric lighting. The latest 'Royal Scot' conversion is No. 6162 , which was completed on 19/12. No. 6154 is the next to be dealt with. The next 'Pacific' No. 6257 (No. 5 of Order E464) is rapidly taking shape together with the first Class '5' 4-6-0 under Order E468 (ten engines), No. 4748; this batch are all to be fitted with Caprotti valve gear and roller bearings. The L.M.S. lettering has already started to disappear from both tank and tender sides, but so far, locomotives receiving a general repair are still being repainted in the new standard livery. A recent interesting visitor to the Works was ex L.N.W.R. 4-6-0 No. 8824, which received a service repair. More ex L.N.W.R. locomotives have gone to the scrap-heap; they were cut up as follows: (W/E 20/12) 7944, 25845; (W/E 27/12) 6725, 9380; (W/E 3/1) 9215, 27663; (W/E 10/1) 9115, 28401; (W/E 17/1) 25694. SLS/194802
01/02/1948 Crewe Works Locomotives relettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' were M4820 (North Shed), M6170, and M5101 in the Paint Shop. All three had cast plates bolted in front of the existing numberplate on th; smokebox door. New construction at the Works included: Nos. 4767 with Stephenson motion and M4748, first of the Caprotti's outside the Paint Shop. The Erecting Shop contained Nos. 6257 (frames, cylinders, and boiler), 4749 (complete), 4750 (frames, cylinders, and boiler), 4751 (frames and cylinders; boiler not mounted) and 4752 (frames and cylinders only), while out in the Yard were the frames and cylinders for 4753-56 inclusive, and 6154 (presumably next for rebuilding). The Heavy Machine Shop contained the frames and cylinders for the first of the next batch of 4-6-0's, presumably 4738 and also for 4757, as well as the frames only of 6105 SLS/194803
08/01/1961 Crewe Works (Outside Paint Shop) Paint Shop: D77/8, D83/5, D3921, 42179, 45063/8, 45646/95, 48755, L.N.W.R. 1054 and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D74/5/9, D80/2/4, 44767, 45132, 45201, 45348, 45667, 46457, 48529, 48600, 70032, 90346. Works Sidings: 40161, 44697, 44734/82, 44867, 44936, 45336, 45428, 46235, 46430, 49158/99, 49270, 49432, 70021, 84015, 92092, 92160/7. Erecting Shop: D90-6, 42476, 42580, 44869, 45037/48, 45197, 45219/40/50/77/94, 45302/44, 45411/9, 45506/78/82, 45616/38/54/75/80, 46203/9/47/50/5, 46410/36, 48054, 48120/73, 48255, 48438, 48635/68, 48898, 49281, 70033, 90137/8/57/97, 90203/33/51, 90316, 90509, 92018/33/43, 92134/55/65. Outside Erecting Shop: 42295, 45515/60, 46103/36/7, 48508, 49034, 90297, 92048. New Erecting Shop: D76, D81/6-9, D97-102. Cutting-up Shop: Nil. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1947 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4767
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Crewe North (5A)    
01/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 44767    
17/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
14/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 44767    

prev prev