Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 233 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7240 Week
» 13374 Month
» 241258 Year
» 1462823 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 44757 on 31/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service Sat 31/12/1948
Withdrawal w/e Sat 13/11/1965
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 16 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 31/12/1948
10H Lower Darwen w/e 09/11/1963
8M Southport w/e 30/11/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 13/11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 20A Holbeck (MR) w/e 01/01/1949
ALLOC 10H Lower Darwen 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 8M Southport 4w/e 07/12/1963
WDN   w/e 13/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
01/10/1950 Motherwell MPD Several of the 2-10-0 were here, still with old numbers and lettered in old Southern style. Several of the newest 2-6-4T are here, such as 42125/6/7, also visitors from Hamilton. Hamilton on the same day provided a surprise in the presence of a Holbeck 4-6-0, No. 44757, having come in on a Carlisle goods. SLS/195012
26/11/1961 Crewe Works (Paint Shop Yard) Paint Shop: D10, D132-4, 44695, 45101/90, 45200, 45617/74, 45702, 48605, 49395, 78042. Paint Shop Yard: D135, 42213, 44697, 44757, 45608, 45710, 46130, 48252, 48476, 50850, 70048. New Erecting Shop: D1/3/9, D136/7, D214/31, D5140. Erecting Shop: D50-8, D290, 41251, 42148, 42224/55, 42440, 42571, 42679, 44690, 44942-4/89, 45046/92, 45145, 45256/90, 45301/37/86, 45424/93, 45543/52, 45695, 45709, 46133, 46224/53, 46506, 48130, 48399, 48408/45, 48532, 48638/49, 48700/3/36/62, 49130, 49361, 70042, 90188, 90365, 92017/76/82, 92125. Erecting Shop Yard: 42287/94, 44765, 44965, 45186/97, 45719, 46141. Minor Repair Road: 44753, 45646, 92025. Works Sidings: 44746/81, 44887, 45026/42, 45680, 46109, 47255, 47403/5, 48215, 48500/28/51, 78035, 90675, 92016/8, 92163. Scrap Road: 42545, 45401 just cut up, 45630 being cut up, 40033/4/8/64, 40569, 42217, 42467, 42549, 42683, 48927, 49401/53 intact. Works Shunters: 13292, 44374, 51412/46, 47592, 47608/61, 52093, 52218, 52441/59. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/12/1948 To Service To service as British Railways Number 44757
Built at Crewe Works
   
09/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (10H)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (8M)    
13/11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 44757    

prev prev