Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 31 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6007 Week
» 12141 Month
» 240025 Year
» 1461590 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 44756 on 19/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service Mon 19/06/1948
Withdrawal During 09/1964
Scrapping During 02/1965
Service Life 16 yrs, 2 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 19/06/1948
10H Lower Darwen w/e 09/11/1963
8M Southport w/e 30/11/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 20A Holbeck (MR) w/e 19/06/1948
ALLOC 10H Lower Darwen 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 8M Southport 4w/e 07/12/1963
WDN   w/e 24/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1961 Crewe Works (Works Sidings) Paint Shop: D9, D50, D134-7, 42600/9, 44755/81, 44942, 45092, 45680, 46224, 49395, 78035 and the usual preserved locos. Out-side Paint Shop: D5031, 42117, 42639, 45421. 45690, 48205, 70043/9. Erecting Shop: D51-60, D235, D5137, 41200, 42234/67/83/92, 42437, 42606, 44680/4, 44739/49/53, 44806, 44985, 45034, 45147, 45233, 45369/83/95, 45568/9, 45625/39/60/84, 46166, 46230/44, 46485, 48080, 48111/34, 48304, 48429/53, 48518, 48601/74, 48733, 49141. 70031, 78036, 84001, 92025/93, 92167. Outside Erecting Shop: 42073, 45283, 45560, 46152, 70022, 90702. New Erecting Shop: D1/5, D229/31/6, D328, D5073, D5136. Works Sidings: 41262, 42460, 44686, 44756, 45140/5, 45215/27/79/98, 45645. 46109/21/7/50, 46236, 48172, 48416, 48649, 48930/50. 49246, 49313, 70026/42, 78037, 90147, 90413, 92018, 92159. Scrap Road: 47467, 47420, 47570 being cut up, 40074, 42220. 44088, 44249, 45544, 47755, 47405. 50850 intact. Works Shunters: D3584, 43957, 44374, 47618/61/77, 51412/46, 52093. SLS/196202
16/04/1963 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D1030-34, D1064-73 (in various stages of construction), D1550 body built (Brush 2750 H.P. D.E.)- New Construction. D210/17, D305/10/16/30/36/43/73, D8003/14/18, 44675/89, 44756, 44810/28, 45410, 45531, 46515/22, 48404/44, 48526, 48680, 70016/23/46, 82042, 92035, 92127/46/52/53 92207/39. Outside Erecting Shop: 45322, 70035, 80136, For Butlin's Camp, Pwllheli 46100, For Butlin's Camp, Skegness 46203. Yard: 42182, 42426/69, 42592, 44877, 45067, 45126, 45481, 46106/08/23/27, 47380, 82036, 92104/201. Paint Shop and Outside: D1062/3, D57, D214, 44710, 44869, 45002/26/33/42, 45481, 46486, 48660, 92044/97/155 78002. Scrap Road: 46124/34/35. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
19/06/1948 To Service To service as British Railways Number 44756
Built at Crewe Works
   
09/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (10H)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (8M)    
09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 44756    

prev prev