Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2010 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15416 Week
» 68432 Month
» 187959 Year
» 3214812 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways (BR Tmp) |
M4751 |
on |
13/03/1948 |
British Railways |
44751 |
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
187 |
To Service |
Mon 13/03/1948 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1964 |
Service Life |
16 yrs, 5 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/03/1948 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 4751 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
19/03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44751 |
|
|
10/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
18/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44751 |
|
|
02/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|