Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 589 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4449 Week
» 7031 Month
» 271664 Year
» 1493229 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 44746 on 07/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service Sat 07/08/1948
Withdrawal w/e Sat 01/02/1964
Scrapping During 08/1964
Service Life 15 yrs, 5 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 07/08/1948
22A Bristol Barrow Road 5w/e 16/07/1949
20A Holbeck (MR) 8w/e 29/11/1952
22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 21/05/1955
14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 16/06/1957
9A Longsight 4w/e 14/06/1958
26A Newton Heath w/e 30/04/1960
26A Newton Heath w/e 17/09/1960
26A Newton Heath w/e 01/10/1960
26C Bolton w/e 14/04/1962
   Withdrawn w/e 01/02/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 20A Holbeck (MR) w/e 07/08/1948
ALLOC 22A Bristol Barrow Road w/e 09/07/1949
ALLOC 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 15/06/1957
ALLOC 9A Longsight 4w/e 14/06/1958
LOAN 26A Newton Heath 5w/e 30/04/1960
LOAN 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 24/09/1960
LOAN 26A Newton Heath 5w/e 29/10/1960
ALLOC 26C Bolton 5w/e 05/05/1962
WDN   w/e 01/02/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
26/11/1961 Crewe Works (Works Sidings) Paint Shop: D10, D132-4, 44695, 45101/90, 45200, 45617/74, 45702, 48605, 49395, 78042. Paint Shop Yard: D135, 42213, 44697, 44757, 45608, 45710, 46130, 48252, 48476, 50850, 70048. New Erecting Shop: D1/3/9, D136/7, D214/31, D5140. Erecting Shop: D50-8, D290, 41251, 42148, 42224/55, 42440, 42571, 42679, 44690, 44942-4/89, 45046/92, 45145, 45256/90, 45301/37/86, 45424/93, 45543/52, 45695, 45709, 46133, 46224/53, 46506, 48130, 48399, 48408/45, 48532, 48638/49, 48700/3/36/62, 49130, 49361, 70042, 90188, 90365, 92017/76/82, 92125. Erecting Shop Yard: 42287/94, 44765, 44965, 45186/97, 45719, 46141. Minor Repair Road: 44753, 45646, 92025. Works Sidings: 44746/81, 44887, 45026/42, 45680, 46109, 47255, 47403/5, 48215, 48500/28/51, 78035, 90675, 92016/8, 92163. Scrap Road: 42545, 45401 just cut up, 45630 being cut up, 40033/4/8/64, 40569, 42217, 42467, 42549, 42683, 48927, 49401/53 intact. Works Shunters: 13292, 44374, 51412/46, 47592, 47608/61, 52093, 52218, 52441/59. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/08/1948 To Service To service as British Railways Number 44746
Built at Crewe Works
   
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (22A)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A)    
21/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (22A)    
16/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
01/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
14/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
01/02/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 44746    

prev prev