Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 83 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7090 Week
» 13224 Month
» 241108 Year
» 1462673 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 44744 on 03/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service Sat 03/07/1948
Withdrawal w/e Sat 09/11/1963
Scrapping During 01/1964
Service Life 15 yrs, 4 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 03/07/1948
22A Bristol Barrow Road 5w/e 16/07/1949
20A Holbeck (MR) 8w/e 29/11/1952
22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 21/05/1955
17A Derby 4w/e 18/05/1957
27A Bank Hall 4w/e 14/06/1958
27C Southport w/e 17/03/1962
9A Longsight w/e 18/05/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 09/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 20A Holbeck (MR) w/e 03/07/1948
ALLOC 22A Bristol Barrow Road w/e 09/07/1949
ALLOC 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 31/03/1962
ALLOC 9A Longsight 4w/e 01/06/1963
WDN   w/e 09/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/07/1948 Crewe Works (North Shed) Four more Class '5' 4-6-0's of Order E469 Nos. 44743 , 44744 , 44745 and 44746 were completed on 3/6, 10/6, 21/6 and 29/6 respectively, while the remaining engine of that order (No. 44747) is already in an advanced state of completion.
Two more 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0's have been rebuilt with taper boilers: No. 5532 completed on 16/6 and No. 5512 on 30/6. Nos. 5525/27 will be the next to be rebuilt, in that order.
The frames for the first three '2P' 2-6-2T's of Order E470 were noted in the Erecting Shop on 1/7; the boiler, cab and tanks had already been fitted to No. 41210. The following withdrawn locomotives were noted in the carriage sheds:-Eastern shed Nos. 6679, 6747, 7700/96, 7812/41, 8910, 28097, 28230, 28350, 28367, 28415/41, 28542/86/97; Western shed Nos. 6653/89/91/92, 6870/78, 7840, 9273, 28234. Further ex L.N.W.R. locomotives have gone to the scrap heap during the past month. They were cut-up as follows:-W/E 6/6 Nos. 7772, 7892, 7938, 9383; W/E 12/6 Nos. 6883, 6927, 25350; W/E 19/6 Nos. 6605/46, 6739; W/E 26/6 Nos. 6894, 9233, 28594; W/E 3/7 Nos. 7740, 25787.
During the W/E 26/6, W.D. 2-10-0 No. 73799 North British (12A) was on Works undergoing a minor repair. It is understood that this engine is to be used for testing the new Locomotive Testing Plant at Rugby. Class '5' No. 44826 was re-converted to coal burning during W/E 26/6.
Both Cornwall and Hardwicke have been hauled out of the Paint Shop and overhauled recently; the latter is now also lined out in accordance with ex L.N.W.R. practice.
New construction here was as follows: North Shed No. 44744; Paint Shop Nos. 44745/46, 45532 (Rebuilt); Yard Nos. 45512 (Rebuilt), 41214/15 an 44757 (frames and cylinders); Erecting Shop Nos. 44747 (complete), 41210 (frame, cylinders, boiler and tanks), 41211 (frame, cylinders, tank and boiler (not mounted)), 41212 (frame, cylinders and boiler (not mounted)), 41213 (frame and cylinders), 5525 (being rebuilt), 5527 (for rebuilding); Heavy Machine Shop Nos. 41216-18 (frames and cylinders), 41219 (frame only).
SLS/194808

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/07/1948 To Service To service as British Railways Number 44744
Built at Crewe Works
   
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (22A)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A)    
21/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (22A)    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
17/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
18/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
09/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 44744    

prev prev