Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 254 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7261 Week
» 13395 Month
» 241279 Year
» 1462844 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 44743 on 26/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service Sat 26/06/1948
Withdrawal w/e Sat 08/01/1966
Scrapping During 05/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 17 yrs, 6 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 26/06/1948
22A Bristol Barrow Road 5w/e 16/07/1949
17A Derby 4w/e 18/05/1957
27A Bank Hall 4w/e 14/06/1958
27C Southport w/e 17/03/1962
8C Speke Junction w/e 14/11/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 08/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 20A Holbeck (MR) w/e 26/06/1948
ALLOC 22A Bristol Barrow Road w/e 09/07/1949
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 31/03/1962
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 05/12/1964
WDN   w/e 08/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/06/1948 To Service To service as British Railways Number 44743
Built at Crewe Works
   
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (22A)    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
17/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
14/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
08/01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 44743    

prev prev