Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 263 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7270 Week
» 13404 Month
» 241288 Year
» 1462853 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 44742 on 03/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service Sat 03/07/1948
Withdrawal w/e Sat 02/05/1964
Scrapping During 06/1964
Service Life 15 yrs, 9 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 03/07/1948
9A Longsight 4w/e 03/10/1953
21D Aston w/e 10/09/1960
6G Llandudno Junction w/e 01/10/1960
8C Speke Junction w/e 23/09/1961
27A Bank Hall w/e 06/01/1962
27C Southport w/e 17/03/1962
   Withdrawn w/e 02/05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 7A Llandudno Junction w/e 03/07/1948
ALLOC 9A Longsight 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 21D Aston 4w/e 24/09/1960
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 5w/e 29/10/1960
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 27/01/1962
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 31/03/1962
WDN   w/e 02/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/07/1948 To Service To service as British Railways Number 44742
Built at Crewe Works
   
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (21D)    
01/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
23/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
06/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
17/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
02/05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 44742    

prev prev