Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1606 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15649 Week
» 80603 Month
» 283267 Year
» 3310120 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
44725 |
on |
30/04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
192 |
To Service |
Sat 30/04/1949 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/10/1967 |
Service Life |
18 yrs, 5 mths , 14 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
30/04/1949 |
68A |
|
|
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
8C |
|
Speke Junction |
w/e |
14/03/1964 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
5A |
Crewe North |
w/e |
30/04/1949 |
LOAN |
68A |
|
w/e |
07/05/1949 |
ALLOC |
68A |
|
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
ALLOC |
8C |
Speke Junction |
4w/e |
04/04/1964 |
WDN |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/04/1949 |
Steel Fireboxes |
New class '5M.T.' Nos, 44725 is fitted with a steel firebox. |
SLS/194906 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/04/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 44725 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
14/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44725 |
|
|
03/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|