Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 3406 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16812 Week
» 69828 Month
» 189355 Year
» 3216208 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
44723 |
on |
30/04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
192 |
To Service |
Wed 30/04/1949 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 19/10/1966 |
Service Life |
17 yrs, 5 mths , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1967 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
68A |
|
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
ALLOC |
60A |
Inverness |
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
67A |
Corkerhill |
4w/e |
04/06/1960 |
ALLOC |
67D |
Ardrossan |
5w/e |
07/03/1964 |
ALLOC |
67E |
Dumfries |
4w/e |
09/05/1964 |
ALLOC |
67A |
Corkerhill |
5w/e |
11/06/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/10/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/04/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 44723 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
04/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
28/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D) |
|
|
30/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dumfries (67E) |
|
|
25/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
19/10/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44723 |
|
|
01/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|