Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 331 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18134 Week
» 71150 Month
» 190677 Year
» 3217530 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
44716 |
on |
27/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
192 |
To Service |
Sat 27/11/1948 to Crewe North (5A) |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 31/07/1965 |
Service Life |
16 yrs, 8 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
5A |
Crewe North |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
ALLOC |
5B |
Crewe South |
4w/e |
08/05/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
31/07/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
29/01/1961 |
Market Harborough MPD |
The sub shed of Leicester is supplied with two engines for its two turns viz. Welham shunt (Class 4F) and Ivatt 2-6-2T for Seaton workings; 41321 has been working this latter turn and leaves shed at 7-05 a.m. for Seaton. Locomotives on shed on 29th January were 41321, 43949, 44242/9, 44716, 46445, 48010/36/529/671 an 90554. |
SLS/196103 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/11/1948 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 44716 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
29/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
08/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
31/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44716 |
|
|
09/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|