Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1019 Today
» 1408 Yesterday
» 3664 Week
» 6246 Month
» 270879 Year
» 1492444 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 44693 m/e 11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 11/1950 to Low Moor (25F)
Withdrawal Mon 29/05/1967
Scrapping During 11/1967
Service Life 16 yrs, 6 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
25F Low Moor (New) m/e 11/1950
56D Mirfield w/e 18/04/1964
56F Low Moor 4w/e 03/12/1966
   Withdrawn 29/05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 25F Low Moor w/e 02/12/1950
ALLOC 56D Mirfield 4w/e 09/05/1964
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 8w/e 31/12/1966
WDN   29/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/10/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D122-6, 42604/68, 44729/59, 44928, 45210/61, 45594, 45635/98, 46427, 49395 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D127, 42447, 42655, 44733, 45077, 45316, 45699, 46225, 78017, 92133. New Electing Shop: D8, D128/9/35-7, D327, D5016/74. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5, D227, D329. Erecting Shop: D130-4, D224, 41209/39, 42050/62, 42289/99, 42465, 42607, 44666/93, 44774, 44836/90, 44934/90, 45003/67, 45102/5/8, 45204/52/62/3, 45332/40, 45454, 45549/50, 45688/90, 46114/43, 46234, 46426, 48036/46/74/85, 48283, 48494, 48611/53, 48712, 49025/70, 49381, 70052, 71000, 90216/42/71, 90486, 92013/81/94, 92150. Outside Erecting Shop: D216, 42446, 42656, 45131, 45505, 45634/83, 48717, 78043, 92123. Minor Repair Road: 45646, 48451. Works Sidings: 41279, 42425, 42574, 44708/17/20/36/7/71, 44864/71, 45154, 45571/96, 45656, 46105/7/38/60, 46406, 48088, 48217, 48477, 48624/36, 49126, 90529/61. Scrap Yard: 40075/7/97, 40118, 42506, 43325, 47421/38/62, 47634, 52389 intact. Works Shunters: D3175, 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 47608, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. SLS/196111
15/10/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D124-8, 42667/8, 44679/82/3, 44729/30, 45131, 45210, 45594, 45698, 46108/60, 49395, 78043. Outside Paint Shop: D123, 41209, 42425, 42656, 44696, 44774, 44893/4, 44988, 45108, 45262, 45635/56, 48085, 48283, 48477, 48717, 49025, 49125, 70052, 71000, 92081. Works Sidings: 42619/65, 44845, 45041, 45204/85, 45549, 46425, 47448, 48660, 49070, 49381, 90218, 92024/67. Erecting Shop: D8, D129-34, 41209/79, 42050, 42289/99, 42436/65, 42607/31, 44666/93/5, 44708/17/37, 44864/76/90, 44934/90, 45038/67, 45105, 45207/52/95, 45332, 45420, 45505/50/71/3, 45688/90, 45740. 46105/7, 48036/46/74, 48217, 48365, 48451, 48611/24/36/53, 48712, 49423, 90121, 90216/42/71, 90486, 90561, 92119/50. Outside Erecting Shop: D5141, 42062, 45003, 45102, 45263, 45340, 45454, 45646, 46113/43, 46234, 46426, 48494, 92013. New Erecting Shop: D135-7, D227, D327, D5016. Outside New Erecting Shop: D329. Scrap Yard-intact: 40075/7/97, 47421/38/62, 47634 intact. Scrap Yard-just cut up: 40118, 42506, 43325, 43863, 52389. Works Shunters: 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 51446, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441/59, D3763. SLS/196111

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1950 To Service To service as British Railways Number 44693
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Low Moor (25F)
   
18/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (56D)    
03/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
29/05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 44693    

prev prev