Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 1155 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 5970 Week
» 12104 Month
» 239988 Year
» 1461553 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 44692 on 31/10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service Sat 31/10/1950 to Bank Hall (27A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 14/05/1966
Scrapping During 08/1966
Service Life 15 yrs, 6 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
27A Bank Hall (New) 31/10/1950
24A Accrington 4w/e 05/11/1955
24B Rose Grove w/e 04/03/1961
27C Southport w/e 17/06/1961
27B Aintree w/e 17/03/1962
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 18/05/1963
10D Lostock Hall w/e 11/07/1964
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 10/10/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 14/05/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24A Accrington 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove 4w/e 04/03/1961
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 31/03/1962
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 10/10/1964
WDN   w/e 14/05/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1956 York MPD (York station) December, 1955-January, 1956. On 28/12/55 60152 (64B), ex-works, was in York shed yard, and 60161 (64B) in similar circumstances on 5/1/56. 67764 (53B) was also at York on 28/12/55 en route for Darlington Works, whilst 67724 (30A) which had called at York, in rather poor condition, on 9/11/55, returned southward bound from Darlington Works on 12/1/56 in a more attractive state. On 29/12/55 new B.R. Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73106 from Doncaster was at York, with 76024 (52C) passing through for Doncaster Works. On the following day a very smart 60919 (61B) worked an up goods into Dringhouses during the course of running-in. from Darlington. On 4/1/56 44592 (5B) was an unusual visitor to York, whilst 63760 (54B) put in an appearance while on route for overhaul at Gorton.
On the same day three very rusty and forlorn 'Sl' 0-8-4Ts were at York en route for scrapping at Darlington, namely 69900 (36A), 69902 (36B), 69904 (36B). 69900/04 were hauled in by 61188 (38A) in particularly smart trim. 69902 was still at York on the following day which was also marked by the unusual simultaneous appearance in York station of two 'B17s', 61626 (31A) and 61656 (32A); the former brought in the 7.20 a.m. Colchester to Newcastle train which has also recently produced Woodford V2s 60890 an 60915 instead of the more-usual Doncaster or March engine. On 12/1/56 unusual visitors were 43088 (35A), and from the L.M.R. 44692 (24A) and 45211 (25G). The beginning of the year saw the number of 'J25s' in store at York south shed reduced to two, i.e., 65675 an 65677, but the ex-L.M.S.. shed still contains 69864 (50G), 62702 (50A), 62746 (50D) and 62761 (50D) in store. 62730 (50A) is still dumped out of service in the north shed yard but 62345 is at last showing signs of awakening from her-very prolonged hibernation.
SLS/195605

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/10/1950 To Service To service as British Railways Number 44692
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Bank Hall (27A)
   
05/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
04/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
17/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
18/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
11/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
10/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
14/05/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 44692    

prev prev