Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1029 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4889 Week
» 7471 Month
» 272104 Year
» 1493669 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 44691 on 31/10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service Sat 31/10/1950 to Bank Hall (27A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 01/04/1967
Scrapping During 12/1967
Service Life 16 yrs, 5 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
27A Bank Hall (New) 31/10/1950
17A Derby 4w/e 14/06/1958
14D Neasden w/e 21/02/1959
15E Leicester (G.C.) w/e 18/06/1960
17A Derby w/e 22/10/1960
14E Bedford w/e 10/06/1961
2F Woodford Halse w/e 22/09/1962
15E Leicester (G.C.) w/e 10/08/1963
2E Saltley w/e 02/11/1963
2B Oxley w/e 03/04/1965
12C Barrow in Furness w/e 20/08/1966
12D Workington w/e 17/12/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 01/04/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 14D Neasden 4w/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 15E Leicester (G.C.) 5w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 17A Derby 5w/e 29/10/1960
ALLOC 14E Bedford 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 2F Woodford Halse 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 15E Leicester (G.C.) 5w/e 07/09/1963
ALLOC 2E Saltley 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 2B Oxley 2w/e 10/04/1965
ALLOC 12C Barrow in Furness 5w/e 10/09/1966
ALLOC 12D Workington 4w/e 31/12/1966
WDN   w/e 01/04/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/03/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shops) Paint Shop: D90/5, 41247/50/5/7/9/64/82, 45228, 45658, 48686, 48733, L.N.W.R. 1054, and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D86/9/91-3, 44768, 48470. 48693, 49395, 84012. Works Sidings: 42584, 42678, 44665, 44868, 45101/90/8, 45205/64, 45391, 45500/4, 45612, 46101/64, 47271, 47672, 48101/22, 48437, 48628/57, 48734, 49149/73, 49335, 78030/4/64, 90313/43, 92009, 92159. Erecting Shops: D94/100-7, 41203/26, 42086, 42557/67, 42657/86, 44664/91, 44738/73, 44802/22/40, 44917, 45062/95, 45106/13/6/48/85, 45217/38/41/57, 45302/14/39/72/92, 45425/46, 45514, 45629/45/98, 45702/8, 46139/44, 46231, 47008, 48345, 48502, 48659, 49122, 49431, 70042, 71000, 90064, 90110, 90207/92, 90399, 90544/79/84, 92046/69. Outside Erecting Shops: 45000/15, 45533, 46421, 48895, 49328, 49448, 92135. New Erecting Shop: D96-9/108/9. Outside New Erecting Shop: D110. Scrap Road: 40001, 42397, 42438, 43194, 43333, 43562, 49243, with 45511 just cut-up. Leaving Works: 45341, 45613, 48705, 92087. Works Shunters: 12020, 44373/4, 47592, 47618, 51412/46, 52312, 52441/64. SLS/196104
11/01/1964 Worcester Works 1024 (82C), 2232 (85A), 6954 (82B), 6981 (82B), 9490 (85A), 44691 (2E), D2123 (85A). In store awaiting scrap: 3207, 5022, 5205, 6807, 6948, 7000/31, W20, W23 an W26. SLS/196402
24/01/1965 Crewe Works (Side of Works) Erecting shop: D1661-71, D1672-7 bodies, D225, D267, D299, D335, D1502/10/21/35/68/9, D1604/7, D1724/44, D5710, D6854, D8048, 42141/252/468/699, 44682/773/841/965, 48163/8/204/327/612/77/97/739, 70008/15/23/42/5, 92015/93/167/9. Outside: D1653/60, D1515, D1701, D229, 44684, 48315/751, 92002. Side of Works: 44691/717, 45300, 70022/35, 48035/322/423. Paint shop: E3704, 71000 stored, D236, D347, D1655/6/9, D5714. Outside: D1654/7/8, D1756, D5700, D6853, D8060, E3018, 45193, 48212, 78041, 92047/132/9. Traverser area: 44778, D233, D382, D1511/30, D1688, D5703, D7594, D8036/42/61. SLS/196503
21/03/1965 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D1675-D1681, D1842-D1850, 44685/91, 44717/77, 45347, 45446, 45589, 48151/208/423/557, 70002/9/17/41, 77014, 78028, 92009/76, D5702/3, D8064, D204/20/8/55/68/91, D375/99, D1506/9/16/9/26, D1684/6; Traverser area: D258, D317/28/72, D1521/5/82, D1689, D1717, E27004, 48170/312/615, 92013; Waiting Works: D324, D1517/50, 44800, 44829, 44905, 45006/327, 48077/124/97/364/87/93/433/632/49/66, 70032, 92017; Electric shop: E26015/44, E3011/5/6/20/2/56; Paint shop: D1669/70/1/3/4, D8004/54, E3007, 71000 (Stored); Outside: 44807, 45303, 48470, 48646, 92107, 92133, 92205, D213, D1510/39/76, D8037/49. Also noted: D2708/11/22/41/2/3 an D1734 ex Salop accident. SLS/196505

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/10/1950 To Service To service as British Railways Number 44691
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Bank Hall (27A)
   
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (14D)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E)    
22/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
10/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bedford (14E)    
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F)    
10/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (2E)    
03/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (2B)    
20/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C)    
17/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Workington (12D)    
01/04/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 44691    

prev prev