Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 36 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6012 Week
» 12146 Month
» 240030 Year
» 1461595 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 44689 on 30/09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service Sat 30/09/1950 to Bank Hall (27A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 04/03/1967
Scrapping During 12/1967 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 16 yrs, 5 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
27A Bank Hall (New) 30/09/1950
24A Accrington 4w/e 05/11/1955
24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 19/05/1956
27A Bank Hall m/e 16/06/1956
24A Accrington 4w/e 11/08/1956
24B Rose Grove w/e 04/03/1961
27C Southport w/e 17/06/1961
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 18/05/1963
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 22/06/1963
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 25/07/1964
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 07/11/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 04/03/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24A Accrington 4w/e 05/11/1955
LOAN 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 19/05/1956
EXLOAN 24A Accrington 4w/e 14/07/1956
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove 4w/e 04/03/1961
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 08/08/1964
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 07/11/1964
WDN   w/e 04/03/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/04/1963 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D1030-34, D1064-73 (in various stages of construction), D1550 body built (Brush 2750 H.P. D.E.)- New Construction. D210/17, D305/10/16/30/36/43/73, D8003/14/18, 44675/89, 44756, 44810/28, 45410, 45531, 46515/22, 48404/44, 48526, 48680, 70016/23/46, 82042, 92035, 92127/46/52/53 92207/39. Outside Erecting Shop: 45322, 70035, 80136, For Butlin's Camp, Pwllheli 46100, For Butlin's Camp, Skegness 46203. Yard: 42182, 42426/69, 42592, 44877, 45067, 45126, 45481, 46106/08/23/27, 47380, 82036, 92104/201. Paint Shop and Outside: D1062/3, D57, D214, 44710, 44869, 45002/26/33/42, 45481, 46486, 48660, 92044/97/155 78002. Scrap Road: 46124/34/35. SLS/196304
15/11/1964 Crewe Works (Erecting shop) Erecting shop: D1641-1662; D214, D224, D236, D257, D351, D395/7, D5700/14, D6833/49, D8014/26/35/59, 42581, 42665, 44689, 44710/74, 45215/79, 46484, 48056, 48190, 48301, 48533/56, 48719/40, 92008/74/9/87/8; Near Chester line: 44715, 44844, 44988, 45000, 45660, 46402, 92019; Side of Works: 42089, 42218, 42569, 44658, 44778, 44838, 44989, 45035, 45303, 45412, 45562, 46501, 48168, 48612, 92004/64, 92117/67. Paint shop area: D251, D297, D305, D329, D336, D369, D1633/4/5/7/8/9/40, D5716, D6889, D8058, 42233, 48046/50, 70002/11/34, 92233; Cutting up: 42221, 42559; New Erecting shop: D338, E3002/4, 26025; Inspection road: 44667, 45031, 48206/52, 92139/57; Misc.: 42267/97, 44730, 45089, 45130, 48153/92, 48212/67, 48345/65, 48455, 48529, 48677/85, 48764, 70015/18/37, 80072, 92206, D219, D293, D6774, D8001/36, 26049. SLS/196412

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/09/1950 To Service To service as British Railways Number 44689
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Bank Hall (27A)
   
05/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
19/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
04/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
18/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
25/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
07/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
04/03/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 44689    

prev prev