Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 46 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7053 Week
» 13187 Month
» 241071 Year
» 1462636 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 44687 on 31/05/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service Sat 31/05/1951 to Longsight (9A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/01/1966
Scrapping During 03/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 14 yrs, 7 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
9A Longsight (New) 31/05/1951
5B Crewe South w/e 10/09/1960
6G Llandudno Junction w/e 08/10/1960
8M Southport w/e 14/09/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 22/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 4w/e 24/09/1960
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 5w/e 29/10/1960
ALLOC 8M Southport 5w/e 12/10/1963
WDN   w/e 22/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
23/07/1961 Crewe Works (Outside Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D110-2, 42121, 42235, 42579, 42658/9/77, 44987, 45224, 45415/35, 45588, 49395. Outside Paint Shop: D108/13-5, 45658. Works Sidings: 40580, 42377, 42481, 42507, 42602, 44148/75, 44728/66/79, 44824, 44929/49, 45005, 45247, 45445, 45516/44, 45610/30, 46110/35, 47277, 48154, 49049, 90194, 90323, 90621, 92096. Erecting Shop: D116-21, D269, 41229/68, 42158, 42218, 42562/89, 42610, 44374, 44658/85/6, 44821/71/88, 45045/75, 45104/85/99, 45218/48/54/96, 45333/45/73, 45529/89, 45611/8/9/61/72, 46102/31/55, 46243, 46441, 48287, 48393, 48446, 48697, 48732/61/7, 90264, 90327/81, 90646/58, 92030/2/72/7. Outside Erecting Shop: 42086, 42234, 42652, 44687, 45189, 45410, 46142. New Erecting Shop: D76, D122-8, D331, D5142. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5078. Scrap Yard: 43268, 43962, 47418, 58305 intact, 41529 just cut up. Works Shunters: 12071, 42984, 43957, 47618, 51412/44/6, 52093, 52312, 52441/59. SLS/196109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/05/1951 To Service To service as British Railways Number 44687
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Longsight (9A)
   
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
08/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (8M)    
22/01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 44687    

prev prev