Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1506 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 28685 Week
» 19741 Month
» 366165 Year
» 3393018 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Midland Railway |
84 |
y/e |
1891 |
Midland Railway (1907) |
397 |
y/e |
1907 |
British Railways |
40397 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
1808 |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Order Number |
920 |
To Service |
During 06/1891 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 03/03/1951 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 9 mths , 0 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1951 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
13A |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
w/e |
11/03/1950 |
LOAN |
8E |
|
w/e |
13/05/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
03/03/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 1904 |
H boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1891 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 84 |
|
|
1904 |
Modification |
Modification: H boiler fitted |
|
|
1907 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 397 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40397 |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (10B) |
|
|
1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
03/03/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40397 |
|
|