Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 709 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31359 Week
» 130004 Month
» 332668 Year
» 3359521 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
932 |
m/e |
05/1927 |
British Railways |
40932 |
w/e |
10/09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
Compound |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 05/1927 |
Withdrawal |
During 08/1956 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1956 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 932 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hellifield (20G) |
|
|
29/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
10/09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40932 |
|
|
13/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (22B) |
|
|
1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
08/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40932 |
|
|