Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 716 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31366 Week
» 130011 Month
» 332675 Year
» 3359528 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
1167 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
British Railways |
41167 |
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
Compound |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4020 |
To Service |
During 10/1925 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 11/10/1958 |
Service Life |
33 yrs , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 1167 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4020 |
|
|
22/06/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
26/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 41167 |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
20/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) |
|
|
07/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
11/10/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 41167 |
|
|
06/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|