Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3018 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33668 Week
» 132313 Month
» 334977 Year
» 3361830 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
1116 |
m/e |
07/1925 |
British Railways |
41116 |
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1957 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 1116 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23250 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Monument Lane (3E) |
|
|
26/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 41116 |
|
|
30/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brunswick (8E) |
|
|
14/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
08/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
09/11/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 41116 |
|
|
12/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|