Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1015 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31665 Week
» 130310 Month
» 332974 Year
» 3359827 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
1074 |
m/e |
10/1924 |
British Railways |
41074 |
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
Compound |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 10/1924 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 07/08/1954 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 10 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1954 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1924 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 1074 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gloucester Barnwood (22B) |
|
|
03/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 41074 |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
1954 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
07/08/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 41074 |
|
|