Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 844 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14250 Week
» 67266 Month
» 186793 Year
» 3213646 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4268 |
m/e |
11/1919 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
213 |
Works Number |
2848 |
To Service |
During 11/1919 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 25/08/1965 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 9 mths , 25 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1919 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4268 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2848 |
|
|
07/03/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
|
|
30/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llantrisant (86D) |
|
|
12/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88B) |
|
|
08/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdare (88J) |
|
|
07/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
25/08/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4268 |
|
|
12/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|