Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4158 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34808 Week
» 133453 Month
» 336117 Year
» 3362970 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
42155 |
on |
16/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 16/06/1948 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 15/05/1965 |
Service Life |
16 yrs, 10 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/06/1948 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 42155 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
23/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
24/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (4A) |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (4A) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
21/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
28/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (9K) |
|
|
15/05/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42155 |
|
|
08/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|