Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 2634 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 28668 Week
» 127313 Month
» 329977 Year
» 3356830 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2270 |
on |
12/02/1947 |
British Railways |
42270 |
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 12/02/1947 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 26/01/1963 |
Service Life |
15 yrs, 11 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sat 20/04/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/02/1947 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2270 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dalry Road (28B) |
|
|
04/06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42270 |
|
|
01/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
06/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (6H) |
|
|
06/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
26/01/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42270 |
|
|
20/04/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|