|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
06/07/1961 | St. Rollox Works (Steam Erecting Shop) | Diesel Erecting Shop: D3132, D3410, D3528, D5300/3/10/1, D6120/37. Works Yard : 42243, 45157, 45489/92, 57328, 57631, D6111. Steam Erecting Shop: 42690/3, 42804, 42913, 44724, 44820/98, 44920/55, 45047, 45118, 45687/96, 45727, 57617. Waiting Works : 42167, 42780, 44722. Ex-Works: D3279, 42882, 44954, 45083, 45126. | SLS/196108 |
01/05/1965 | Cowlairs Works (Erecting shop) | Erecting shop: 42138/693, 44727/92, 44845/949/91/7, 45034/54/115/82/390, 76050, 73053/100, 80122, 90199; Outside: 45012/28, 45403/51, 73151, 76024. | SLS/196506 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1945 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2693 Built at Derby Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Polmadie (27A) | ||
05/06/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 42693 | ||
25/12/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
14/03/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stirling (63B) | ||
09/04/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Beattock (68D) | ||
10/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 42693 | ||
01/1967 | Scrapped | Scrapped |