30/04/1950 |
Derby Works |
Nos. 46100 an 46155 are being converted to taper-boiler 'Scots.' New Work. On 19/5, 2-6-4 tanks Nos. 42143/4 were complete (the latter in the Paint Shop), and frames for the next two were erected. New 2-6-4 tanks for the Ulster Transport Authority were also in progress. No. 54 had the boiler and tanks mounted, and the frames of Nos. 55 and 56 were in position. Entering Works during April: These included Nos. 377, 526, 40537, 40675, 41003/09/21/23/34/47/51/84, 1085, 41094, 1158, 1699, 1773/79/80, 1814, 42327/74/88, 42500/16/31/34, 2992, 43211, 3313/42/94, 3401/08, 43411, 3457, 43660, 3833/44, 43857/58/69, 3946, 43976, 44050, 4066, 44163, 44216,4313, 44316, 4432/34, 44394, 44555, 4605, 58137, 58283, W.R. No. 2156. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40014/42/48, 40418, 41073, 42348/60/86/97. In addition. the following also carry the crest: Nos. 43401, 43507/95/98, 43832, 43962, 44092, 44153, 44273, 44532/78, 53807, 58121, 58214, 47212, 47345, 47448, W.R. Nos. 2134/36/86, while Nos. 40037/40, 40417, 40557, 40675, 40930, 41014/91/97, 41158, 41727, 42305, 42407., 42505/35, 43342, 43810/33/58/70, 43940, 44434, 47400/66, 47587 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' 58214 is believed to be the first Class '2F' to receive the crest. Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: w/e 14/4 No. 1322; w/e 21/4 Nos. 561, 3408. Stored locomotives: On 28/4 Nos. 404, 40411/16, 41059 were noted stored near the station. |
SLS/195006 |
19/12/1958 |
Derby Works (Works Yard) |
Paint shop-42337, 42518, 43960, 73044, 12043, D5005. D/E Erecting shop-10203, 10800, 12035, 13026/37/9, 15004, ED2, ED7, and last two of order D658 D3571/2. Test House-D3570, D5006. Erecting shop: 1 bay-42410G, 42421I, 44247G, 44276I, 44408G, 4463G, 47165I, 47464I, 48371I, 48403G, 48408G, 48637G, 48760I, 75026G, 80081I, 1 bay stripping-42378, 42381; Erecting shop: 2 bay-42516I, 44501G, 48063I, 48322I, 2 bay stripping-44009, 44400; Erecting shop: 3 bay-D5008-14 New, Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D1, 3, 4 & 5, 1Co-Co1 2300 H.P.; Works Yard-40047, 40680, 41083, 41090, 42534, 43186, 43856, 44053, 47309, 48533, 48611, 48639, 12096, D2(fr.), D3569, D5084/7. Locomotives stored-40538, 43881, 43930, 44142, 44369, 58132 an 49418. |
SLS/195901 |
17/11/1961 |
Derby Works (In Works Sidings) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D44, D80, D2504, D2908/9/13, D8017/37, 10202, 11118/45. Former Paint Shop: D3122/3, D5143, 10203, 12100. Diesel Test House: D142/3. Shunter Test House: 12054. New Building: D141, D147-D156. Finishing Shop: D85, D144-D146. Erecting Shop: D3015/22, 12068/82/4, 42369, 42503, 43593, 43620, 43940/75, 44118, 44263, 44332, 44560, 47391/9, 47460/72, 47656, 48033, 48170/92, 48304, 48552, 58218, 58850 heavy repairs nearly completed, 73136/56. Paint Shop: D140, M.R. 1000 sheeted, 48110. In Works Sidings: ED3, 12000, 41168, 42328/95, 42404, 42510/21/4/34, 43295, 43368, 43826/32, 43905, 44033, 44581, 47218/73, 47865/83, 47529/43, 48005, 73044, 73133/42/58. |
SLS/196112 |
15/12/1961 |
Derby Works (Works Sidings) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D85, D92, D2220, D2504, D2908/9, D5091, D8037, 11118/55. Former Paint Shop: D77, D107, D2506. Test House: D88, D98, D146/7/50, D5019, 10202, 12068. Shunter Test House: 12082. New Building: D152-D161. Finishing Shop: D149/51, D2503, D5016, D8016. Erecting Shop: 12088, 12101, 42416, 42588, 43929, 44043, 44202/11/44, 44401, 44539, 47307/22, 47435/64, 47649, 48005/50/61, 48334, 73044, 73133, 75031/60. Paint Shop: D148, MR 1000 (sheeted), 42366, 58850 (bearing cast iron plate mounted in the centre of each side tank with the number 2650 and the words L.&-N.W.R. BOW WORKS 1880). Works Sidings: ED3, 12000/62, 13169, 41168, 42236, 42328/30/2/63/95, 42404/12, 42448, 42510/21/4/34, 43295, 43368, 43826/32, 47161, 47218, 47444, 47664, 48079, 48392, 48495, 58174/5, 73142. |
SLS/196201 |
04/01/1962 |
Derby Works (Works Sidings) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D85, D122, D2220, D2502/4, D2904/9, D5015/6/9, D8016/37, 11155, 44211 (for painting). New Building: D154/5 (engines in), D156-61 (bodywork complete), D162-4 (Body shells only). Finishing Shop: D74, D99, D152/3, D2503. Erecting Shop: 12062/88, 12101, 13169/74, 42236, 42313, 42416, 41826, 43925/63/71, 44156, 44200, 44411, 47161, 47257/79, 47349, 47587, 47664/71, 48117. 48293, 48392, 48495. 73133. 75019/31. New Paint Shop: D151, M R. 1000 (sheeted), 44043, 47307/22. 48061. Works Sidings: D72, D98, D101, D111, D126, ED3, 12000, 41168, 42078, 42328/30/2/55/63/95, 42404/12/48, 42510/21/4/34/88, 43295, 43368, 43658, 43832, 47218, 47444, 48775, 58174/5. LNW 2650. Shunters : D2377/81/83. 47000. |
SLS/196202 |