Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3054 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 30233 Week
» 21289 Month
» 367713 Year
» 3394566 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2558 |
on |
12/08/1936 |
British Railways |
42558 |
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/08/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2558 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24314 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
29/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42558 |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southport (23C) |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
15/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E) |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
17/04/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42558 |
|
|
09/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|