Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1386 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 32036 Week
» 130681 Month
» 333345 Year
» 3360198 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2547 |
m/e |
07/1936 |
British Railways |
42547 |
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1963 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1936 |
24B |
|
Rose Grove |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
04/05/1963 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
24B |
Rose Grove |
5w/e |
02/03/1946 |
ALLOC |
24B |
Rose Grove |
4w/e |
30/03/1946 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
04/05/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2547 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24303 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
28/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42547 |
|
|
04/05/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42547 |
|
|
08/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|